From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
01/31/2010
Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution.
05/04/2009
In committee: Set first hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted.
04/13/2009
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
02/05/2009
Referred to Coms. on NAT. RES. and L. GOV.
12/02/2008
From printer. May be heard in committee January 1.