02/02/2010 | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | |||
01/31/2010 | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. | |||
05/28/2009 | In committee: Set, second hearing. Held under submission. | |||
04/23/2009 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |||
04/01/2009 | From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 1). | |||
03/04/2009 | Referred to Com. on INS. | |||
02/13/2009 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 15. | |||
02/12/2009 | Read first time. To print. |