LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB282
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB282
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB282
Compare Versions
AB282 Chaptered October 11, 2009
AB282 Enrolled September 11, 2009
AB282 Amended September 2, 2009
AB282 Amended July 13, 2009
AB282 Amended June 30, 2009
AB282 Amended June 8, 2009
AB282 Introduced February 12, 2009
Version 1 (Old)
AB282 Chaptered October 11, 2009
AB282 Enrolled September 11, 2009
AB282 Amended September 2, 2009
AB282 Amended July 13, 2009
AB282 Amended June 30, 2009
AB282 Amended June 8, 2009
AB282 Introduced February 12, 2009
Version 2 (New)
Compare