|
08/06/2009
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 96, Statutes of 2009.
|
|
|
|
08/05/2009
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
07/30/2009
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 2:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
07/01/2009
|
Withdrawn from Governor. Ordered returned to enrollment.
|
|
|
|
06/30/2009
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
|
06/25/2009
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 2262.)
|
|
|
|
06/22/2009
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after June 24 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
06/22/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1377.)
|
|
|
|
06/16/2009
|
Ordered to Special Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/10/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/09/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 9).
|
|
|
|
05/12/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
04/30/2009
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
04/13/2009
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
04/13/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 823.)
|
|
|
|
04/01/2009
|
Read second time. To Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
03/31/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (March 31).
|
|
|
|
03/24/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Re-referred. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (March 23).
|
|
|
|
03/04/2009
|
Referred to Coms. on B. & F. and JUD.
|
|
|
|
02/14/2009
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 16.
|
|
|
|
02/13/2009
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|