LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB287
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB287
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB287
Compare Versions
AB287 Chaptered October 11, 2009
AB287 Enrolled September 11, 2009
AB287 Amended September 2, 2009
AB287 Amended August 17, 2009
AB287 Amended June 10, 2009
AB287 Amended May 21, 2009
AB287 Amended April 13, 2009
AB287 Introduced February 13, 2009
Version 1 (Old)
AB287 Chaptered October 11, 2009
AB287 Enrolled September 11, 2009
AB287 Amended September 2, 2009
AB287 Amended August 17, 2009
AB287 Amended June 10, 2009
AB287 Amended May 21, 2009
AB287 Amended April 13, 2009
AB287 Introduced February 13, 2009
Version 2 (New)
Compare