|
06/29/2010
|
In committee: Set second hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted.
|
|
|
|
06/14/2010
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
05/27/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2010
|
Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
05/18/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/20/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. Re-referred. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (May 20).
|
|
|
|
05/14/2009
|
Referred to Com. on L. GOV. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2009
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 1239.)
|
|
|
|
04/27/2009
|
Read second time. To Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
04/23/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (April 22).
|
|
|
|
04/02/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 1).
|
|
|
|
03/04/2009
|
Referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
|
02/14/2009
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 16.
|
|
|
|
02/13/2009
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|