LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB289
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB289
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB289
Compare Versions
AB289 Enrolled September 13, 2010
AB289 Amended August 27, 2010
AB289 Amended August 20, 2010
AB289 Amended August 17, 2010
AB289 Amended August 2, 2010
AB289 Amended July 15, 2010
AB289 Amended June 22, 2010
AB289 Amended May 28, 2010
AB289 Amended April 21, 2010
AB289 Amended January 25, 2010
AB289 Amended August 17, 2009
AB289 Amended April 14, 2009
AB289 Introduced February 13, 2009
Version 1 (Old)
AB289 Enrolled September 13, 2010
AB289 Amended August 27, 2010
AB289 Amended August 20, 2010
AB289 Amended August 17, 2010
AB289 Amended August 2, 2010
AB289 Amended July 15, 2010
AB289 Amended June 22, 2010
AB289 Amended May 28, 2010
AB289 Amended April 21, 2010
AB289 Amended January 25, 2010
AB289 Amended August 17, 2009
AB289 Amended April 14, 2009
AB289 Introduced February 13, 2009
Version 2 (New)
Compare