|
09/30/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 565, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
09/30/2010
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/13/2010
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 5 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2010
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 67. Noes 8. Page 6865.)
|
|
|
|
08/27/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 32. Noes 0. Page 4963.)
|
|
|
|
08/25/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2010
|
Withdrawn from committee. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/23/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(c).
|
|
|
|
08/20/2010
|
From inactive file. To second reading. Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
|
09/10/2009
|
To inactive file on motion of Senator Lowenthal.
|
|
|
|
09/09/2009
|
Read third time, passage refused. (Ayes 16. Noes 22. Page 2336.) Motion to reconsider made by Senator Lowenthal. Reconsideration granted. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2336.)
|
|
|
|
08/18/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 4.) (August 17).
|
|
|
|
08/17/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/13/2009
|
In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
07/06/2009
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
06/23/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 6. Noes 4.) (June 23).
|
|
|
|
06/04/2009
|
Referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
|
05/28/2009
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/28/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 44. Noes 29. Page 1759.)
|
|
|
|
05/26/2009
|
Action rescinded and record expunged whereby a final roll call vote was taken.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 6.) (May 13).
|
|
|
|
05/12/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/11/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/22/2009
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/21/2009
|
From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (April 13).
|
|
|
|
03/27/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
|
03/26/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
03/04/2009
|
Referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
|
02/14/2009
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 16.
|
|
|
|
02/13/2009
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|