|
10/11/2009
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 232, Statutes of 2009.
|
|
|
|
10/11/2009
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/25/2009
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 5 p.m.
|
|
|
|
09/08/2009
|
Returned by the Governor at the request of the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
08/28/2009
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 2:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2009
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 2704.)
|
|
|
|
08/20/2009
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 22 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 31. Noes 1. Page 1894.)
|
|
|
|
07/01/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/30/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 29).
|
|
|
|
06/22/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/11/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (June 10).
|
|
|
|
05/21/2009
|
Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
|
05/11/2009
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/11/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 1354.)
|
|
|
|
04/30/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 29).
|
|
|
|
04/21/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/20/2009
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/16/2009
|
From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 13).
|
|
|
|
02/14/2009
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 16.
|
|
|
|
02/13/2009
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|