|
10/11/2009
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 233, Statutes of 2009.
|
|
|
|
10/11/2009
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/25/2009
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 5 p.m.
|
|
|
|
09/10/2009
|
In Assembly. To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
09/09/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 30. Noes 3. Page 2316.)
|
|
|
|
09/08/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
09/04/2009
|
From inactive file. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
07/13/2009
|
To inactive file on motion of Senator Negrete McLeod.
|
|
|
|
07/06/2009
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
06/23/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (June 23).
|
|
|
|
05/21/2009
|
Referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
|
05/11/2009
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/11/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 64. Noes 10. Page 1348.)
|
|
|
|
04/23/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 2.) (April 22).
|
|
|
|
04/13/2009
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/02/2009
|
From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 17. Noes 1.) (April 1).
|
|
|
|
02/14/2009
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 16.
|
|
|
|
02/13/2009
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|