|
08/27/2009
|
In committee: Held under submission.
|
|
|
|
08/17/2009
|
In committee: Placed on Appropriations suspense file.
|
|
|
|
07/16/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 15).
|
|
|
|
07/07/2009
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
06/04/2009
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
05/28/2009
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/28/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 47. Noes 31. Page 1756.)
|
|
|
|
05/27/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/26/2009
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. (Corrected May 27.)
|
|
|
|
05/21/2009
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 4.) (May 20).
|
|
|
|
05/07/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Corrected May 26.)
|
|
|
|
05/06/2009
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
05/05/2009
|
From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (April 29).
|
|
|
|
04/21/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
04/20/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2009
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 20.
|
|
|
|
02/17/2009
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|