|
01/14/2010
|
Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
|
|
|
|
10/26/2009
|
Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
|
10/11/2009
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/25/2009
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 5 p.m.
|
|
|
|
09/10/2009
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 55. Noes 23. Page 3284.)
|
|
|
|
09/09/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 26. Noes 12. Page 2324.)
|
|
|
|
09/08/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
09/04/2009
|
Read third time, amended. To second reading. (Corrected September 15.)
|
|
|
|
09/02/2009
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
09/01/2009
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 8. Noes 5.) (August 27).
|
|
|
|
08/17/2009
|
In committee: Placed on Appropriations suspense file. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/09/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (July 8).
|
|
|
|
06/18/2009
|
Referred to Com. on L. & I.R.
|
|
|
|
06/04/2009
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 52. Noes 25. Page 2026.)
|
|
|
|
06/01/2009
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
|
05/29/2009
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (May 28).
|
|
|
|
05/20/2009
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
04/23/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 22).
|
|
|
|
04/20/2009
|
From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on L. & E. Re-referred. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 20).
|
|
|
|
04/16/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on RULES by unanimous consent.
|
|
|
|
04/15/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on U. & C.
|
|
|
|
04/13/2009
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on U. & C. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
02/05/2009
|
Referred to Coms. on U. & C. and NAT. RES.
|
|
|
|
12/02/2008
|
From printer. May be heard in committee January 1.
|
|
|
|
12/01/2008
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|