|
10/11/2009
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 364, Statutes of 2009.
|
|
|
|
10/11/2009
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/28/2009
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 11:30 a.m.
|
|
|
|
09/10/2009
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 50. Noes 28. Page 3274.)
|
|
|
|
09/08/2009
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 10 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
09/03/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 22. Noes 15. Page 2162.)
|
|
|
|
09/02/2009
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
09/01/2009
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 8. Noes 5.) (August 27).
|
|
|
|
08/17/2009
|
In committee: Placed on Appropriations suspense file.
|
|
|
|
07/20/2009
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
07/08/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 3. Noes 2.) (July 7).
|
|
|
|
06/04/2009
|
Referred to Com. on E., R., & C.A.
|
|
|
|
05/21/2009
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/21/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 49. Noes 29. Page 1612.)
|
|
|
|
05/11/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/07/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 5.) (May 6).
|
|
|
|
04/29/2009
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
04/01/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (March 31).
|
|
|
|
02/05/2009
|
Referred to Com. on E. & R.
|
|
|
|
12/02/2008
|
From printer. May be heard in committee January 1.
|
|
|
|
12/01/2008
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|