|
11/30/2010
|
From Senate committee without further action.
|
|
|
|
07/07/2009
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Testimony taken. Further hearing to be set.
|
|
|
|
06/30/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
|
06/23/2009
|
Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
|
06/22/2009
|
From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on N.R. & W. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 17).
|
|
|
|
06/10/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
|
06/04/2009
|
Referred to Coms. on L. GOV. and N.R. & W.
|
|
|
|
05/28/2009
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/28/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 1742.)
|
|
|
|
05/26/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/21/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (May 20).
|
|
|
|
04/29/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 28).
|
|
|
|
04/21/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on W.,P. & W.
|
|
|
|
04/20/2009
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/16/2009
|
From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on W.,P. & W. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 15).
|
|
|
|
04/13/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
|
04/02/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
03/04/2009
|
Referred to Coms. on L. GOV. and W.,P. & W.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2009
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 20.
|
|
|
|
02/17/2009
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|