|
09/29/2010
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/07/2010
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 12 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2010
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Ayes 49. Noes 27. Page 6562.) Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 50. Noes 27. Page 6562.)
|
|
|
|
08/23/2010
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 25 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/23/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 22. Noes 14. Page 4802.)
|
|
|
|
08/19/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/18/2010
|
Read third time, amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/17/2010
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2010
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 4.) (August 12).
|
|
|
|
08/27/2009
|
In committee: Held under submission.
|
|
|
|
07/06/2009
|
In committee: Placed on Appropriations suspense file.
|
|
|
|
06/29/2009
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
06/23/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 22).
|
|
|
|
06/11/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on EQ. Re-referred. (Ayes 7. Noes 3.) (June 10).
|
|
|
|
05/21/2009
|
Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and EQ.
|
|
|
|
05/11/2009
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/11/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 49. Noes 27. Page 1348.)
|
|
|
|
04/23/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 4.) (April 22).
|
|
|
|
04/02/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/01/2009
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
03/31/2009
|
From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (March 24).
|
|
|
|
03/04/2009
|
Referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2009
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 20.
|
|
|
|
02/17/2009
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|