|
10/11/2009
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 430, Statutes of 2009.
|
|
|
|
10/11/2009
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/28/2009
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 11:30 a.m.
|
|
|
|
09/11/2009
|
Urgency clause adopted. Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 3354.)
|
|
|
|
09/10/2009
|
From committee: With recommendation: That Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 7. Noes 3.) (September 10).
|
|
|
|
09/09/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. Joint Rule 62(a), file notice waived. (Page 3230.)
|
|
|
|
09/08/2009
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 10 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
09/03/2009
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed and to Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2159.)
|
|
|
|
09/01/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2009
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. (received by desk August 28, 2009 pursuant to JR61(a)(11))
|
|
|
|
08/25/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (August 25).
|
|
|
|
08/20/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
07/08/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Re-referred. (Ayes 3. Noes 2.) (July 8).
|
|
|
|
07/01/2009
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
06/24/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
|
05/21/2009
|
Referred to Coms. on L. GOV. and PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2009
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 1444.)
|
|
|
|
05/05/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (May 5).
|
|
|
|
03/24/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on B. & P.
|
|
|
|
03/23/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
03/04/2009
|
Referred to Com. on B. & P.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2009
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 20.
|
|
|
|
02/17/2009
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|