|
01/14/2010
|
Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
|
|
|
|
10/26/2009
|
Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
|
10/11/2009
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/28/2009
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 1 p.m.
|
|
|
|
09/09/2009
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 3152.) Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 57. Noes 15. Page 3166.)
|
|
|
|
09/08/2009
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 10 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
09/04/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 3. Page 2210.)
|
|
|
|
09/03/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
09/02/2009
|
Read third time, amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/18/2009
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/17/2009
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 10. Noes 3.) (July 23).
|
|
|
|
07/23/2009
|
Joint Rule 62(a) suspended. (Page 1804.)
|
|
|
|
07/09/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (July 8).
|
|
|
|
06/04/2009
|
Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
|
05/28/2009
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/28/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 60. Noes 4. Page 1738.)
|
|
|
|
05/21/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 1.) (May 20).
|
|
|
|
05/05/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2009
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/30/2009
|
From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (April 27).
|
|
|
|
04/20/2009
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
04/13/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. In committee: Hearing for testimony only.
|
|
|
|
04/02/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2009
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 20.
|
|
|
|
02/17/2009
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|