02/02/2010 | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | |||
01/31/2010 | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. | |||
01/21/2010 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. In committee: Set, first hearing. Held without recommendation. | |||
01/13/2010 | From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (January 12). | |||
04/14/2009 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Held without recommendation. | |||
03/23/2009 | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. | |||
02/18/2009 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 20. | |||
02/17/2009 | Read first time. To print. |