|
10/11/2009
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 432, Statutes of 2009.
|
|
|
|
10/11/2009
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/25/2009
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 5 p.m.
|
|
|
|
09/10/2009
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 3262.)
|
|
|
|
09/09/2009
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
|
|
|
|
09/08/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 4. Page 2290.)
|
|
|
|
09/01/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 8. Noes 5.) (August 27). (received by desk August 28, 2009 pursuant to JR61(a)(11))
|
|
|
|
07/13/2009
|
In committee: Placed on Appropriations suspense file.
|
|
|
|
06/28/2009
|
Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/26/2009
|
From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 23).
|
|
|
|
06/16/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
06/11/2009
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2009
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 1836.)
|
|
|
|
05/29/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 28). Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
04/23/2009
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
04/01/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (March 31).
|
|
|
|
02/19/2009
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2009
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|