|
08/12/2010
|
In committee: Held under submission.
|
|
|
|
07/15/2010
|
In committee: Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
|
06/24/2010
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
05/05/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (May 5).
|
|
|
|
02/11/2010
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
01/28/2010
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
01/27/2010
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed and to Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 3886.)
|
|
|
|
01/25/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
01/21/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (January 21).
|
|
|
|
01/19/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
01/15/2010
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
01/14/2010
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (January 13).
|
|
|
|
01/07/2010
|
From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on ED. Re-referred. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (January 7).
|
|
|
|
01/04/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on RULES. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
|
|
|
|
10/30/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
|
|
|
|
10/26/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/13/2009
|
Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
02/19/2009
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2009
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|