|
10/11/2009
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 235, Statutes of 2009.
|
|
|
|
10/11/2009
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/11/2009
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 7 p.m.
|
|
|
|
09/03/2009
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 2970.) Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 2974.)
|
|
|
|
09/02/2009
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 4 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
09/01/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 2051.)
|
|
|
|
08/19/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/18/2009
|
Read third time, amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
07/06/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (July 6).
|
|
|
|
06/22/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 9. Noes 1.) (June 22).
|
|
|
|
06/10/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on B., P. & E.D. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. Re-referred. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 9).
|
|
|
|
06/01/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
|
05/21/2009
|
Referred to Coms. on T. & H. and B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
|
05/11/2009
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/11/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 1355.)
|
|
|
|
04/30/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 29).
|
|
|
|
04/15/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 14).
|
|
|
|
03/26/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on B. & P.
|
|
|
|
03/25/2009
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
03/24/2009
|
From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (March 23).
|
|
|
|
03/04/2009
|
Referred to Coms. on TRANS. and B. & P.
|
|
|
|
02/19/2009
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2009
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|