LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB319
Action History
CA
California Assembly Bill AB319
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB319
Action History
02/02/2010
From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
01/31/2010
Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution.
04/21/2009
In committee: Set first hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted.
04/13/2009
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E. & R. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E. & R.
03/04/2009
Referred to Com. on E. & R.
02/19/2009
From printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
02/18/2009
Read first time. To print.