02/02/2010 | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | |||
01/31/2010 | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. | |||
05/28/2009 | In committee: Set, second hearing. Held under submission. | |||
04/29/2009 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |||
04/16/2009 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
04/15/2009 | Read second time and amended. | |||
04/14/2009 | From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 13). | |||
03/04/2009 | Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. | |||
02/19/2009 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. | |||
02/18/2009 | Read first time. To print. |