|
01/14/2010
|
Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
|
|
|
|
10/26/2009
|
Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
|
10/11/2009
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/25/2009
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 5 p.m.
|
|
|
|
09/09/2009
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 3152.) Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 3175.)
|
|
|
|
09/08/2009
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 10 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
09/04/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2225.)
|
|
|
|
09/02/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading. Ordered to Special Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
09/01/2009
|
From inactive file. To second reading. Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
|
06/24/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading. To inactive file on motion of Senator Denham.
|
|
|
|
06/23/2009
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
06/15/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/09/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 9).
|
|
|
|
05/14/2009
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2009
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 1240.)
|
|
|
|
04/27/2009
|
Read second time. To Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
04/23/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (April 22).
|
|
|
|
04/01/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. Re-referred. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (March 31).
|
|
|
|
02/19/2009
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2009
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|