02/02/2010 | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | |||
01/31/2010 | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. | |||
05/28/2009 | In committee: Set, second hearing. Held under submission. | |||
05/20/2009 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |||
05/07/2009 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
05/06/2009 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended. | |||
04/29/2009 | From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 28). | |||
04/15/2009 | Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S. | |||
04/14/2009 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HUM. S. Read second time and amended. | |||
04/13/2009 | Referred to Com. on HUM. S. | |||
02/19/2009 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. | |||
02/18/2009 | Read first time. To print. |