|
01/14/2010
|
Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
|
|
|
|
08/17/2009
|
Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
|
08/05/2009
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
|
07/30/2009
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 2:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
07/01/2009
|
Withdrawn from Governor. Ordered returned to enrollment.
|
|
|
|
06/30/2009
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
|
06/24/2009
|
In Assembly. To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
06/24/2009
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed and to Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1429.)
|
|
|
|
06/22/2009
|
Ordered to Special Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/18/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/17/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 17).
|
|
|
|
04/30/2009
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
04/16/2009
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
04/16/2009
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed and to Senate. (Ayes 70. Noes 0. Page 939.)
|
|
|
|
04/13/2009
|
Read second time. To Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
04/02/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (April 1).
|
|
|
|
03/18/2009
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
02/19/2009
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. (Corrected July 8.) (Corrected July 9.)
|
|
|
|
02/18/2009
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|