|
07/16/2009
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 18, Statutes of 2009.
|
|
|
|
07/15/2009
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
07/14/2009
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 10:30 a.m.
|
|
|
|
07/09/2009
|
In Assembly. To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
07/09/2009
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed and to Assembly. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 1665.)
|
|
|
|
07/02/2009
|
Ordered to Special Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/30/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/29/2009
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
06/17/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 17).
|
|
|
|
06/08/2009
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
06/04/2009
|
Referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
|
05/28/2009
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/28/2009
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed and to Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1766.)
|
|
|
|
05/26/2009
|
Read second time. To Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/21/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (May 20).
|
|
|
|
05/05/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2009
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/30/2009
|
From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 29).
|
|
|
|
04/27/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
|
04/23/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
03/18/2009
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
02/19/2009
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2009
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|