02/02/2010 | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | |||
01/31/2010 | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. | |||
04/28/2009 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | |||
03/31/2009 | In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
03/24/2009 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
03/10/2009 | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. | |||
03/09/2009 | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended. | |||
02/19/2009 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. | |||
02/18/2009 | Read first time. To print. |