|
01/14/2010
|
Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
|
|
|
|
10/26/2009
|
Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
|
10/11/2009
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/25/2009
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 5 p.m.
|
|
|
|
09/10/2009
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 48. Noes 29. Page 3256.)
|
|
|
|
09/08/2009
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 10 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
09/03/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 22. Noes 16. Page 2169.)
|
|
|
|
07/09/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/08/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 3. Noes 2.) (July 8).
|
|
|
|
07/01/2009
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
06/25/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
|
06/11/2009
|
Referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2009
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 48. Noes 31. Page 1873.)
|
|
|
|
05/11/2009
|
Read third time, amended, and returned to third reading. (Page 1349.).
|
|
|
|
04/23/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 5.) (April 22).
|
|
|
|
04/02/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (April 1).
|
|
|
|
02/19/2009
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2009
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|