|
09/24/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 225, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
09/23/2010
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/13/2010
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 5 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/27/2010
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 73. Noes 1. Page 6793.)
|
|
|
|
08/26/2010
|
From committee: With recommendation: That Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (August 26).
|
|
|
|
08/25/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 6680.)
|
|
|
|
08/24/2010
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 26 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4829.)
|
|
|
|
08/20/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/19/2010
|
Read third time, amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (August 12). Received August 13 pursuant to JR 61(b)(14).
|
|
|
|
08/02/2010
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
|
06/22/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 22).
|
|
|
|
06/10/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
05/27/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
05/20/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10.
|
|
|
|
09/09/2009
|
Read third time. Urgency clause refused adoption. Passage refused in Senate. (Ayes 25. Noes 11. Page 2344.) Motion to reconsider made by Senator Negrete McLeod. Reconsideration granted. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2345.)
|
|
|
|
08/31/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (August 27). (received by desk August 28, 2009 pursuant to JR61(a)(11))
|
|
|
|
08/17/2009
|
In committee: Placed on Appropriations suspense file.
|
|
|
|
07/23/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/14/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (July 13).
|
|
|
|
07/13/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on B., P. & E.D. Re-referred. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (July 9).
|
|
|
|
07/01/2009
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
06/18/2009
|
Referred to Coms. on B., F. & I. and B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2009
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading. Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 65. Noes 6. Page 1942.)
|
|
|
|
06/01/2009
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
|
05/29/2009
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 13. Noes 4.) (May 28).
|
|
|
|
05/13/2009
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
04/29/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 28).
|
|
|
|
04/21/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Re-referred. (Ayes 10. Noes 1.) (April 20).
|
|
|
|
04/13/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.
|
|
|
|
04/02/2009
|
Referred to Coms. on B. & F. and B. & P. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & F. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
12/02/2008
|
From printer. May be heard in committee January 1.
|
|
|
|
12/01/2008
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|