LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB340
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB340
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB340
Compare Versions
AB340 Amended January 12, 2010
AB340 Amended January 4, 2010
AB340 Amended May 12, 2009
AB340 Amended March 24, 2009
AB340 Introduced February 18, 2009
Version 1 (Old)
AB340 Amended January 12, 2010
AB340 Amended January 4, 2010
AB340 Amended May 12, 2009
AB340 Amended March 24, 2009
AB340 Introduced February 18, 2009
Version 2 (New)
Compare