|
10/11/2009
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 237, Statutes of 2009.
|
|
|
|
10/11/2009
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/11/2009
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 7 p.m.
|
|
|
|
09/03/2009
|
In Assembly. To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
09/02/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 2105.)
|
|
|
|
09/01/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (August 27). (received by desk August 28, 2009 pursuant to JR61(a)(11))
|
|
|
|
08/17/2009
|
In committee: Placed on Appropriations suspense file.
|
|
|
|
07/15/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (July 14).
|
|
|
|
07/06/2009
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
07/01/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. Re-referred. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (July 1).
|
|
|
|
06/18/2009
|
Referred to Coms. on ED. and JUD.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2009
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading. Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1949.)
|
|
|
|
06/01/2009
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
|
05/29/2009
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 28).
|
|
|
|
05/13/2009
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
04/30/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/29/2009
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/28/2009
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 28).
|
|
|
|
04/23/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. Re-referred. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 22).
|
|
|
|
04/15/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
04/14/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
02/20/2009
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
|
|
|
|
02/19/2009
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|