LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB344
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB344
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB344
Compare Versions
AB344 Chaptered October 11, 2009
AB344 Enrolled September 10, 2009
AB344 Amended September 1, 2009
AB344 Amended July 23, 2009
AB344 Amended April 15, 2009
AB344 Introduced February 19, 2009
Version 1 (Old)
AB344 Chaptered October 11, 2009
AB344 Enrolled September 10, 2009
AB344 Amended September 1, 2009
AB344 Amended July 23, 2009
AB344 Amended April 15, 2009
AB344 Introduced February 19, 2009
Version 2 (New)
Compare