|
07/09/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 52, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
07/09/2010
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
07/01/2010
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 3:05 p.m.
|
|
|
|
07/01/2010
|
Urgency clause adopted. Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 5917.)
|
|
|
|
06/28/2010
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after June 30 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
06/28/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading. Senate Rule 29.3 suspended. (Page 4088.) Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed and to Assembly. (Ayes 28. Noes 0. Page 4088.)
|
|
|
|
06/24/2010
|
From Consent Calendar. Ordered to third reading. Read third time, amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
06/22/2010
|
Read second time. To Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2010
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/16/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. Re-referred. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 16).
|
|
|
|
06/14/2010
|
Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended.
|
|
|
|
06/10/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
06/07/2010
|
Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/23/2009
|
From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (July 15). Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/07/2009
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
06/18/2009
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2009
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading. Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 71. Noes 4. Page 1950.)
|
|
|
|
06/01/2009
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
|
05/29/2009
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 13. Noes 3.) (May 28).
|
|
|
|
04/29/2009
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
04/16/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/14/2009
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/13/2009
|
From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 1).
|
|
|
|
03/24/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
02/20/2009
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
|
|
|
|
02/19/2009
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|