|
01/26/2010
|
From inactive file. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
01/25/2010
|
Notice of intention to remove from inactive file given by Assembly Member Block.
|
|
|
|
05/28/2009
|
To inactive file on motion of Assembly Member Block.
|
|
|
|
05/26/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/21/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 4.) (May 20).
|
|
|
|
05/05/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2009
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/30/2009
|
From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (April 27).
|
|
|
|
04/27/2009
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to REV. & TAX. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
04/22/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
|
04/21/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/13/2009
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
03/09/2009
|
Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
|
02/20/2009
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
|
|
|
|
02/19/2009
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|