|
06/29/2010
|
In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
06/22/2010
|
In committee: Set second hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted.
|
|
|
|
06/14/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
04/05/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD. (Corrected April 22.)
|
|
|
|
07/14/2009
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
07/13/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Re-referred. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (July 9).
|
|
|
|
07/01/2009
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
06/23/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B., F. & I.
|
|
|
|
06/18/2009
|
Referred to Coms. on B., F. & I. and JUD. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B., F. & I.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2009
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading. Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 56. Noes 22. Page 1950.)
|
|
|
|
06/01/2009
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
|
05/29/2009
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (May 28).
|
|
|
|
05/13/2009
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
04/28/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 9. Noes 1.) (April 28).
|
|
|
|
04/01/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
03/31/2009
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
03/27/2009
|
From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (March 23).
|
|
|
|
03/09/2009
|
Referred to Coms. on B. & F. and JUD.
|
|
|
|
02/20/2009
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
|
|
|
|
02/19/2009
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|