02/02/2010 | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | |||
01/31/2010 | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. | |||
06/02/2009 | Read third time, amended, and returned to third reading. (Ayes 45. Noes 23. Page 1975.). Re-referred to Com. on ED. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. | |||
04/15/2009 | Read second time. To third reading. | |||
04/14/2009 | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. | |||
04/13/2009 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 3.) (April 1). | |||
03/25/2009 | Re-referred to Com. on ED. | |||
03/24/2009 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended. | |||
03/23/2009 | Referred to Com. on ED. | |||
02/20/2009 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. | |||
02/19/2009 | Read first time. To print. |