|
01/14/2010
|
Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
|
|
|
|
10/26/2009
|
Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
|
10/11/2009
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2009
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 5:15 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/25/2009
|
In Assembly. To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 21. Noes 18. Page 1920.)
|
|
|
|
06/24/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/23/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 23).
|
|
|
|
06/11/2009
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2009
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 47. Noes 32. Page 1874.)
|
|
|
|
05/28/2009
|
Read third time, amended, and returned to third reading. (Page 1727.).
|
|
|
|
05/13/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (May 12).
|
|
|
|
02/24/2009
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 26.
|
|
|
|
02/23/2009
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|