California 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB362 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 23, 2009

Enrolled

Bill September 10, 2009

Amended

Bill July 1, 2009
Bill June 28, 2009
Bill April 28, 2009
Bill April 15, 2009
Bill April 2, 2009