LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB365
Action History
CA
California Assembly Bill AB365
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB365
Action History
02/02/2010
From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
01/31/2010
Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution.
01/04/2010
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & F. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.
04/20/2009
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
03/09/2009
Referred to Com. on B. & F.
02/24/2009
From printer. May be heard in committee March 26.
02/23/2009
Read first time. To print.