LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB37
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB37
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB37
Compare Versions
AB37 Chaptered October 11, 2009
AB37 Enrolled August 25, 2009
AB37 Amended July 8, 2009
AB37 Amended April 15, 2009
AB37 Amended March 25, 2009
AB37 Amended March 10, 2009
AB37 Introduced December 1, 2008
Version 1 (Old)
AB37 Chaptered October 11, 2009
AB37 Enrolled August 25, 2009
AB37 Amended July 8, 2009
AB37 Amended April 15, 2009
AB37 Amended March 25, 2009
AB37 Amended March 10, 2009
AB37 Introduced December 1, 2008
Version 2 (New)
Compare