|
10/11/2009
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 319, Statutes of 2009.
|
|
|
|
10/11/2009
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/08/2009
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 4:15 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2009
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 2800.)
|
|
|
|
08/27/2009
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 30 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/27/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1969.)
|
|
|
|
07/15/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/14/2009
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
06/30/2009
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/29/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
06/08/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Re-referred. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 8).
|
|
|
|
05/21/2009
|
Referred to Coms. on B., P. & E.D. and PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
05/11/2009
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/11/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1349.)
|
|
|
|
04/23/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 1.) (April 22).
|
|
|
|
03/31/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (March 31).
|
|
|
|
03/24/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on B. & P.
|
|
|
|
03/23/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
03/09/2009
|
Referred to Com. on B. & P.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2009
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 26.
|
|
|
|
02/23/2009
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|