02/02/2010 | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | |||
01/31/2010 | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. | |||
05/28/2009 | In committee: Set, second hearing. Held under submission. | |||
05/13/2009 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |||
05/11/2009 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
05/07/2009 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended. | |||
04/28/2009 | From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 27). | |||
04/22/2009 | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | |||
04/21/2009 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended. | |||
03/16/2009 | Referred to Com. on JUD. | |||
02/24/2009 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 26. | |||
02/23/2009 | Read first time. To print. |