07/08/2009 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
07/06/2009 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | |||
06/18/2009 | Referred to Com. on JUD. | |||
06/03/2009 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |||
06/02/2009 | Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 1912.) | |||
06/01/2009 | Read third time, amended, and returned to third reading. (Page 1816.). | |||
04/01/2009 | Read second time. To third reading. | |||
03/31/2009 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (March 31). | |||
03/24/2009 | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | |||
03/23/2009 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended. | |||
02/24/2009 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 26. | |||
02/23/2009 | Read first time. To print. |