|
08/20/2010
|
Read third time, amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/19/2010
|
From inactive file. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
09/11/2009
|
To inactive file on motion of Senator Romero.
|
|
|
|
07/14/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (July 13).
|
|
|
|
06/24/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (June 23).
|
|
|
|
06/04/2009
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
05/21/2009
|
Referred to Com. on HUMAN S.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2009
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 62. Noes 4. Page 1457.)
|
|
|
|
05/04/2009
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
|
04/30/2009
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 5.) (April 29).
|
|
|
|
04/15/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (April 14).
|
|
|
|
03/09/2009
|
Referred to Com. on HUM. S.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2009
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 26.
|
|
|
|
02/23/2009
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|