02/02/2010 | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | |||
01/31/2010 | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. | |||
05/06/2009 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
04/22/2009 | From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (April 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
04/14/2009 | Re-referred to Com. on P.E.,R. & S.S. | |||
04/13/2009 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on P.E.,R. & S.S. Read second time and amended. | |||
03/09/2009 | Referred to Com. on P.E.,R. & S.S. | |||
02/24/2009 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 26. | |||
02/23/2009 | Read first time. To print. |