|
10/11/2009
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 437, Statutes of 2009.
|
|
|
|
10/11/2009
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/08/2009
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 4:15 p.m.
|
|
|
|
09/01/2009
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 2847.)
|
|
|
|
08/27/2009
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 30 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/27/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1964.)
|
|
|
|
07/07/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/06/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (July 6).
|
|
|
|
06/26/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (June 25).
|
|
|
|
06/22/2009
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on L. & I.R.
|
|
|
|
05/21/2009
|
Referred to Com. on L. & I.R.
|
|
|
|
05/11/2009
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/11/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1364.)
|
|
|
|
05/04/2009
|
Read second time. To Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
04/30/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (April 29).
|
|
|
|
04/15/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/14/2009
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/13/2009
|
From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 1).
|
|
|
|
03/26/2009
|
Referred to Com. on INS.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2009
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 26.
|
|
|
|
02/23/2009
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|