California 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB384 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 23, 2009

Enrolled

Bill August 19, 2010

Chaptered

Bill September 24, 2010

Amended

Bill May 5, 2010
Bill January 4, 2010