06/11/2009 | Referred to Com. on ED. | |||
06/02/2009 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |||
06/01/2009 | Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 1. Page 1838.) | |||
05/29/2009 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 4.) (May 28). Read second time. To third reading. | |||
04/23/2009 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |||
04/01/2009 | From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. Re-referred. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (March 31). | |||
03/09/2009 | Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. | |||
02/24/2009 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 26. | |||
02/23/2009 | Read first time. To print. |