LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB386
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB386
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB386
Compare Versions
AB386 Chaptered October 11, 2009
AB386 Enrolled September 21, 2009
AB386 Amended September 4, 2009
AB386 Amended July 8, 2009
AB386 Amended June 25, 2009
AB386 Amended April 28, 2009
AB386 Amended April 13, 2009
AB386 Introduced February 23, 2009
Version 1 (Old)
AB386 Chaptered October 11, 2009
AB386 Enrolled September 21, 2009
AB386 Amended September 4, 2009
AB386 Amended July 8, 2009
AB386 Amended June 25, 2009
AB386 Amended April 28, 2009
AB386 Amended April 13, 2009
AB386 Introduced February 23, 2009
Version 2 (New)
Compare